Vassios v. Van Buren, County of et al
Plaintiff: Jason Vassios
Defendant: County of Van Buren, Anthony Turner and Van Buren, County of
Case Number: 1:2022cv00007
Filed: January 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Abent, Jonathan)
February 8, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Anthony Turner served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022 (DeRouin, Amy)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 3/7/2022 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 3/2/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
February 7, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to affirmative defenses by plaintiff Jason Vassios re #6 [Attorney Amy J. DeRouin added to party Jason Vassios(pty:pla)] (DeRouin, Amy)
February 7, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Anthony Turner, Van Buren, County of (Bogren, Michael)
February 7, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Charles L. Bogren on behalf of defendants Anthony Turner, Van Buren, County of (Bogren, Charles)
February 7, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Michael S. Bogren on behalf of defendants Anthony Turner, Van Buren, County of (Bogren, Michael)
February 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Van Buren, County of served on 1/19/2022, answer due 2/9/2022 (DeRouin, Amy)
January 12, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonathan Arnold Abent on behalf of plaintiff Jason Vassios (Abent, Jonathan)
January 5, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Anthony Turner, Van Buren, County of (ems)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Hala Y. Jarbou (ems)
January 4, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Trainor, Christopher)
January 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Van Buren, County of, Anthony Turner filed by Jason Vassios (Trainor, Christopher) Modified text on 1/5/2022 (ems).
January 4, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jason Vassios in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6631766 (Trainor, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vassios v. Van Buren, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Vassios
Represented By: Christopher James Trainor
Represented By: Amy J. DeRouin
Represented By: Jonathan Arnold Abent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Turner
Represented By: Charles L. Bogren
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Buren, County of
Represented By: Charles L. Bogren
Represented By: Michael S. Bogren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?