Prentice et al v. Perrigo Company et al
Plaintiff: Kim Prentice and Chastity Kelly
Defendant: Perrigo Company and Perrigo Research & Development
Case Number: 1:2022cv00170
Filed: February 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER approving STIPULATION #4 to extend deadline; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
March 16, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Janet L. Ramsey on behalf of defendants Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development (Ramsey, Janet)
March 15, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Perrigo Research & Development served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022 (Suciu III, Nick)
March 15, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Perrigo Company served on 3/1/2022, answer due 3/22/2022 (Suciu III, Nick)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Answer Deadline by defendants Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development (Amon, Thomas)
March 14, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Thomas M. Amon on behalf of defendants Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development (Amon, Thomas)
March 11, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Simon Carlo Franzini on behalf of plaintiffs Chastity Kelly, Kim Prentice (Franzini, Simon)
March 11, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jonas Bram Jacobson on behalf of plaintiffs Chastity Kelly, Kim Prentice (Jacobson, Jonas)
February 25, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development (ns)
February 24, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ns)
February 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development filed by Kim Prentice, Chastity Kelly (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons to Perrigo Company, #2 Proposed Summons to Perrigo Research & Development) (Suciu III, Nick)
February 24, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Chastity Kelly, Kim Prentice in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6676979 (Suciu III, Nick)
February 24, 2022 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Perrigo Company, Perrigo Research & Development ; filing fee due. (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prentice et al v. Perrigo Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Prentice
Represented By: Nick Suciu III
Represented By: Jonas Bram Jacobson
Represented By: Simon Carlo Franzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chastity Kelly
Represented By: Nick Suciu III
Represented By: Jonas Bram Jacobson
Represented By: Simon Carlo Franzini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Company
Represented By: Janet L. Ramsey
Represented By: Thomas M. Amon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Perrigo Research & Development
Represented By: Janet L. Ramsey
Represented By: Thomas M. Amon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?