Taylor #261843 v. Macauley et al
Plaintiff: Odell Tamar Taylor #261843
Defendant: Matt Macauley and Michigan Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2022cv00310
Filed: March 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $19.91, receipt number GR076841; amount paid to date $19.91 (jmw)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Odell Tamar Taylor #261843 (ns)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: the agency having custody of plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $19.91; interim payments to continue until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents, #2 Affidavit) (ns)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matt Macauley, Michigan Department of Corrections filed by Odell Tamar Taylor #261843 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (ns)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from #1 ) by plaintiff Odell Tamar Taylor #261843 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (ns)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor #261843 v. Macauley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Odell Tamar Taylor #261843
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Macauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?