Johnson #633140 v. Mehaffey et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Johnson #633140
Defendant: Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3, Unknown Party #4, Jason Mehaffey, John Cooper, Nate Tamminga, Dave Royce and Rebecca Casarez
Case Number: 1:2022cv00342
Filed: April 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2022 Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File, Order on Motion to Serve the Complaint #11 , Order Regarding Service - Prisoner #12 sent via U.S. Mail to Bradley Johnson #633140 (ems)
June 8, 2022 NOTICE OF LAWSUIT/REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service delivered to USM as to defendants Rebecca Casarez, John Cooper, Jason Mehaffey, Dave Royce, Nate Tamminga (ems)
June 7, 2022 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (as filed per Order #11 ) against Rebecca Casarez, John Cooper, Jason Mehaffey, Dave Royce, Nate Tamminga filed by Bradley Johnson #633140 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (ems)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING SERVICE: the Clerk is to arrange for service of this order and the complaint upon the defendants; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to file amended compaint; denying as moot #9 motion to serve the complaint; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 1, 2022 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $8.17, receipt number GR077023; amount paid to date $8.17 (jmw)
May 23, 2022 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Bradley Johnson #633140 re MOTION for leave to file an amended complaint #8 (ems)
May 18, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to serve the complaint by plaintiff Bradley Johnson #633140; (ems)
May 18, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to file an amended complaint by plaintiff Bradley Johnson #633140; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint) (ems)
May 11, 2022 Copy of Order to File Amended Pleading on the Form #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Bradley Johnson #633140 (ems)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the filing party to submit an amended pleading in proper form within 28 days or the action may be dismissed; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
April 28, 2022 Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff Bradley Johnson #633140 requesting copy; courtesy copy of complaint #1 mailed to plaintiff on 4/28/22 (ems)
April 15, 2022 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due in 28 Days - Prisoner, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Bradley Johnson #633140 (ems)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: the agency having custody of plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $8.17 ; interim payments to continue until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (sjc)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
April 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (ems)
April 13, 2022 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Bradley Johnson #633140 (ems)
April 13, 2022 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Bradley Johnson #633140 (ems)
April 12, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit by plaintiff Bradley Johnson #633140 (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (ems)
April 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Party #1, Unknown Party #2, Unknown Party #3, Unknown Party #4 filed by Bradley Johnson #633140 (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (ems)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson #633140 v. Mehaffey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Johnson #633140
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Mehaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Tamminga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Royce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Casarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?