Dixon #191514 v. Forsyth et al
Plaintiff: Carl Dixon #191514
Defendant: William A. Forsyth, Christopher Becker, Robin D. Eslinger and Brandy Johnson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00557
Filed: June 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #19 , Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #18 , Opinion (Screening) #17 sent via U.S. Mail to Carl Dixon #191514 (pjw)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed as frivolous, malicious, or for failure to state a claim; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER denying #3 motion to appoint counsel ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 re APPLICATION for entry of default as to all defendants #15 (ems)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 APPLICATION for entry of default as to all defendants (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED as no summons have yet to be issued in this case) (ems) Modified text on 8/2/2022 (ems).
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): initial filing fee installment in the amount of $2.00, receipt number GR077405; amount paid to date $402.00 (mkc)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 requesting docket sheet; court docket sheet mailed on 7/20/22 (pjw)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 for service of subpoena upon Detective Matthew Veldman via regular U.S. mail (ems)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 for service of subpoena upon Iron Mountain Archives of Michigan via regular U.S. mail (ems)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 for service of subpoena upon Robin D. Eslinger of the Kent County Prosecutor's Office via regular U.S. mail (ems)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/5/2022 or the action will be dismissed filing fee to be submitted by 8/5/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Deficiency Order, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Carl Dixon #191514 (ns)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories returned to Carl Dixon #191514 (ems)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories upon defendant Brandy Johnson (ems)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories upon defendant Robin D. Eslinger (ems)
June 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 requesting subpoenas; four (4) AO88B Subpoenas to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects or to Produce Inspection of Premises in a Civil Action (signed and sealed by Deputy Clerk but otherwise blank) along with Subpoena Notice to Parties mailed to plaintiff on 6/30/22 (ems)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 LETTER RETURNING DISCOVERY MATERIAL: Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants returned to Carl Dixon #191514 (jjm)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of receipt of case (jjm)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Carl Dixon #191514 (jjm)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514; (jjm) Modified filing date on 6/17/2022 (jjm).
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of motion by plaintiff Carl Dixon #191514 (jjm)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Christopher Becker, Robin D. Eslinger, William A. Forsyth, Brandy Johnson filed by Carl Dixon #191514 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Summons) (jjm)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number GR077163; for filing fee (jjm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dixon #191514 v. Forsyth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Dixon #191514
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Forsyth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin D. Eslinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?