Verhulst v. Braham
Petitioner: Jason Douglas Verhulst
Respondent: Melinda Braham
Case Number: 1:2022cv00563
Filed: June 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (RESPONSE) #6 filed by petitioner Jason Douglas Verhulst (McDonagh, Paul) Modified text on 8/5/2022 (pjw).
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Judge Robert J. Jonker and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings (pjw)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER setting miscellaneous deadline: pro se misc deadline set for 8/5/2022; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by petitioner Jason Douglas Verhulst re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 and Memorandum in Support of Motion for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2254 (McDonagh, Paul)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (CORRECTED) NOTICE to petitioner regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 7/8/2022 (pjw) Modified text on 6/17/2022, this entry replaces #2 (pjw).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 (DISREGARD) NOTICE to petitioner regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 7/8/2022 (pjw) Modified on 6/17/2022; incorrect entry (pjw).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254 filed by Jason Douglas Verhulst (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Habeas Petition) (McDonagh, Paul)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID re #1 by petitioner Jason Douglas Verhulst in the amount of $5, receipt number AMIWDC-6771476 (McDonagh, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verhulst v. Braham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Douglas Verhulst
Represented By: Paul C. McDonagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Melinda Braham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?