Richardson #255998 et al v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Richardson #255998 and Anthony Dowell #270700
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer, Heidi Washington and Brian Shipman
Case Number: 1:2022cv00854
Filed: September 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment by Richardson in the amount of $26.76, receipt number 100000506; amount paid to date by Richardson $26.76; amount paid to date in case $26.76 (klb) Modified text on 11/2/2022 (klb).
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment by Richardson in the amount of $20.00, receipt number 100000507; amount paid to date by Richardson $46.76; amount paid to date in case $82.53 (klb)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment by Dowell in the amount of $35.77, receipt number 100000506; amount paid to date by Dowell $35.77; amount paid to date in case $62.53 (klb)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment by Dowell in the amount of $10.00, receipt number 100000520; amount paid to date by Dowell $45.77; amount paid to date in case $92.53 (klb)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT that the action is dismissed for failure to state a claim; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Judgment - Frivolous, Malicious, or for Failure to State a Claim (Prisoner Civil Rights Case) #9 , Opinion (Screening) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to both plaintiffs (ns)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for all further proceedings (slk)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case to DJ (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to both plaintiffs (slk)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Anthony Dowell #270700 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (slk) Modified text on 9/27/2022 (slk).
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiffs to pay an initial partial fee Plaintiff Richardson $26.76 and Plaintiff Dowell $35.77 when funds are available; plaintiffs to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Terrance Richardson and Anthony Dowell (slk)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 10/7/2022 (slk)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Terrance Richardson and Anthony Dowell (slk)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by plaintiffs Anthony Dowell #270700, Terrance Richardson #255998 re MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , complaint #1 (slk)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiffs Anthony Dowell #270700, Terrance Richardson #255998; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents for both Plaintiffs) (slk)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Terrance Richardson #255998, Anthony Dowell #270700 (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson #255998 et al v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Richardson #255998
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Dowell #270700
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?