Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. v. Opti-Luxx Inc.
Counter Defendant: Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc.
Counter Claimant: Opti-Luxx Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00915
Filed: October 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #19 holding motion in abeyance and staying discovery on those claims until further order; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: fact discovery to be completed by 2/28/2023; expert discovery to be completed by 4/28/2023; dispositive motions due by 5/26/2023; settlement conference set for 7/5/2023 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 8/3/2023 at 10:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; jury trial set for 8/28/2023 at 09:00 AM at 128 Federal Building, Lansing, MI before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
November 22, 2022 Filing 21 MINUTES of scheduling conference held by video conference before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; case management order to issue (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (sjc)
November 18, 2022 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss Second and Third Counterclaims #19 filed by Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- 3-12-22 Letter to SMG Counsel) (Cunningham, Thomas)
November 18, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss Second and Third Counterclaims by plaintiff Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc., counter-defendant Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc.; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cunningham, Thomas)
November 18, 2022 Filing 18 ANSWER to Counterclaim #11 Count I of Invalidity by Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Cunningham, Thomas) Modified text on 11/18/2022 (eod)
November 16, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE rescheduling hearing (change in judge only) that was previously set for 11/22/2022 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Jarbou; Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/22/2022 at 09:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
November 15, 2022 Filing 16 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Cunningham, Thomas)
November 11, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Emily Chambers Welch on behalf of plaintiff Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc., counter-defendant Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Welch, Emily)
November 11, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of William P. Hurley on behalf of counter-claimant Opti-Luxx Inc., defendant Opti-Luxx Inc. William P. Hurley (Hurley, William)
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #1 , Counterclaim with affirmative defenses and jury demand (Counterclaim not Amended) by Opti-Luxx Inc. (Darnell, Donald) Modified text on 11/14/2022 (mg).
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Videoconference Information for 11/22/22 hearing. RECORDING OR BROADCASTING OF THIS PROCEEDING IS PROHIBITED. W.D. Mich. LGenR 4.1(c)(i) and (ii). [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Opti-Luxx Inc., Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. only] (kjw)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 11/22/2022 at 9:00 AM by video before Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou; status report due by 11/15/2022; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (kjw)
October 31, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Joseph P. Carrier on behalf of counter-claimant Opti-Luxx Inc., defendant Opti-Luxx Inc. /Joseph P. Carrier/ (Carrier, Joseph)
October 28, 2022 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by counter-claimant Opti-Luxx Inc., defendant Opti-Luxx Inc. re Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #11 (Darnell, Donald)
October 28, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. by Opti-Luxx Inc. (Darnell, Donald)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER No. 22-CA-090 that this case is reassigned to Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou and Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings ; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (ns)
October 11, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; Opti-Luxx Inc. served on 10/7/2022, answer due 10/28/2022 (Cunningham, Thomas)
October 6, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Opti-Luxx Inc. (mg)
October 6, 2022 Filing 7 REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office on the filing of a PATENT ACTION (mg)
October 6, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mg)
October 4, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by plaintiff Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Cunningham, Thomas)
October 4, 2022 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Cunningham, Thomas)
October 4, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Cunningham, Thomas)
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Opti-Luxx Inc. filed by Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USPN 11,348,491, #2 Exhibit B - 4-25-2021 Correspondence) (Cunningham, Thomas)
October 4, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6862248 (Cunningham, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc. v. Opti-Luxx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Smartrend Manufacturing Group (SMG), Inc.
Represented By: Thomas W. Cunningham
Represented By: Emily Chambers Welch
Represented By: Robert Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Opti-Luxx Inc.
Represented By: Joseph P. Carrier
Represented By: William P. Hurley
Represented By: Donald C. Darnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?