Ward #728439 v. Loveberry et al
Plaintiff: Tylier Ward #728439
Defendant: Unknown Loveberry, Kyle Mihms, Unknown Jackson, Unknown Party #1 and Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Case Number: 1:2022cv01033
Filed: November 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Kyle Mihms re Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Raines, Austin)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Austin Curtis Raines on behalf of defendant Kyle Mihms for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Raines, Austin)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by December 22, 2022; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Tylier Ward #728439 (eod)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order #7 and Opinion #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Tylier Ward #728439 (pjw)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STATEMENT RE CONSENT by plaintiff Tylier Ward #728439 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (pjw)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $6.60 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff regarding assignment of case and consent; statement regarding consent due 11/28/2022 (mlc)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Tylier Ward (mlc)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case and Consent (Prisoner Civil Rights/State Habeas) #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Tylier Ward (mlc)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Tylier Ward #728439; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Tylier Ward #728439 (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward #728439 v. Loveberry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tylier Ward #728439
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Loveberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Mihms
Represented By: Austin Curtis Raines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?