Thomas #571060 v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Thomas #571060, Jr.
Defendant: Alexander Ray Fox and Angela Moblo Curtis
Case Number: 1:2022cv01038
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $9.93, receipt number 100000938; amount paid to date $9.93 (klb)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Kevin Thomas #571060, Jr; (mlc)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #4 resent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Thomas #571060, Jr. due to address change (mlc)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURNED MAIL: Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 that was sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Thomas #571060, Jr. returned to the Court marked not deliverable as addressed; remailed to current address at Earnest C. Brooks Prison per the MDOC website (mlc)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $9.93 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Thomas (mlc)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Kevin Thomas (mlc)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Kevin Thomas #571060, Jr; (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Financial Documents) (mlc)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Kevin Thomas #571060, Jr (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas #571060 v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Thomas #571060, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Ray Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Moblo Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?