Black v. Capitol Commons II Limited Dividend Housing Association Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL BLACK
Defendant: CAPITOL COMMONS II LIMITED DIVIDEND HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED PARTNERSHIP and FIRST HOUSING CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2022cv01144
Filed: December 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2023 Filing 20 Defendants' ANSWER to complaint #1 by Capitol Commons II Limited Dividend Housing Association Limited Partnership, First Housing Corporation (Scheid, Jenni)
January 30, 2023 Filing 19 LETTER from Judge Dales to Counsel (slk)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER regarding settlement conference: early settlement conference previously scheduled for 2/9/2023 at 1:00 PM by video before the Honorable Sally J. Berens, is RESCHEDULED for an in-person proceeding before Chief Bankruptcy Judge Scott W. Dales, 1 Division Ave., N., Courtroom A, Grand Rapids, Michigan; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
January 20, 2023 Filing 17 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) DOCUMENT Videoconference information for 2/9/2023 early settlement conference [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Daniel Black, Capitol Commons II Limited Dividend Housing Association Limited Partnership, First Housing Corporation only] (jal)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER finding as moot #5 motion for preliminary injunction; denying without prejudice #5 motion for TRO; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 10/31/2023; dispositive motions due by 12/15/2023; early settlement conference set for 2/9/2023 at 01:00 PM at by video before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; settlement conference set for 3/13/2024 at 01:00 PM at 664 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; final pretrial conference set for 4/23/2024 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; jury trial set for 5/7/2024 at 08:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; ; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
January 17, 2023 Filing 14 MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference held before Judge Robert J. Jonker (Court Reporter: Paul Brandell) (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
January 10, 2023 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) planning meeting (Joint Status Report) (Wagner, Robin)
December 29, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE to attorney Beth Rivers regarding recent filing #11 (slk)
December 29, 2022 Filing 11 REPLY to response to motion #5 filed by Daniel Black (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 Dec 7 emails, #3 Exhibit 2 Dec 16 emails, #4 Exhibit 3 July 20 2021 Request, #5 Exhibit 4 Medical Letters, #6 Exhibit 5 Unreported Case) (Rivers, Beth) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (slk).
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 1/17/2023 at 03:00 PM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Judge Robert J. Jonker; joint status report due by 1/10/2023; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
December 27, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for temporary restraining order #5 filed by Capitol Commons II Limited Dividend Housing Association Limited Partnership, First Housing Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Scheid, Jenni)
December 21, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE re #5 of Supplemental Facts by plaintiff Daniel Black (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5) (Wagner, Robin)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #5 motion for TRO; denying #5 motion for preliminary injunction to the extent Plaintiff seeks an ex parte decision. Defendants shall have fourteen days from the date of service to respond to Plaintiff's request for a preliminary injunction; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
December 13, 2022 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Daniel Black re MOTION for preliminary injunction MOTION for temporary restraining order #5 (Wagner, Robin)
December 12, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for preliminary injunction , MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Daniel Black; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2) (Wagner, Robin)
December 6, 2022 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Beth M. Rivers on behalf of plaintiff Daniel Black (Rivers, Beth)
December 5, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Capitol Commons II Limited Dividend Housing Association Limited Partnership, First Housing Corporation (slk)
December 5, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (slk)
December 2, 2022 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Wagner, Robin)
December 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Daniel Black (Wagner, Robin) Modified text on 12/5/2022 (slk).
December 2, 2022 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Daniel Black in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6914392 (Wagner, Robin) Modified text on 12/5/2022 (slk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Capitol Commons II Limited Dividend Housing Association Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL BLACK
Represented By: Robin Beth Wagner
Represented By: Beth M. Rivers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITOL COMMONS II LIMITED DIVIDEND HOUSING ASSOCIATION LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: Jenni Scheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST HOUSING CORPORATION
Represented By: Jenni Scheid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?