Robinson #834348 v. Bladzik
Plaintiff: Nicholas Robinson #834348
Defendant: Unknown Bladzik
Case Number: 1:2022cv01178
Filed: December 12, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Unknown Bladzik re Attorney Appearance (Limited) (Lane, Alicia)
January 23, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) LIMITED ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Alicia Lane on behalf of defendant Unknown Bladzik for purposes of the Prisoner Civil Rights Litigation Early Mediation Program (Lane, Alicia)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STAYING CASE and referring to EARLY MEDIATION: case is stayed for 120 days to allow parties to participate in mediation; collection of the filing fee is suspended; the 90-day period for service is tolled; the MI Attorney General shall enter a limited appearance by January 30, 2023; w/attached Protocol; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (kmd)
January 9, 2023 Copy of Order Staying Case and Referring to Early Mediation Program, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Nicholas Robinson (mlc)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $.83 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
December 14, 2022 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Nicholas Robinson (mlc)
December 13, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
December 13, 2022 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Nicholas Robinson (mlc)
December 12, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Nicholas Robinson #834348; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
December 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Unknown Bladzik filed by Nicholas Robinson #834348 (mlc)
December 12, 2022 STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from #1 ) by plaintiff Nicholas Robinson #834348 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson #834348 v. Bladzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Robinson #834348
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bladzik
Represented By: Alicia Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?