Cooper-Keel v. Keel-Worrell
Plaintiff: Nevin P. Cooper-Keel
Defendant: Garrett Keel-Worrell
Case Number: 1:2022cv01236
Filed: December 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2023 Copy of Order to Show Cause (Hearing), #13 , Ex Parte Motion, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (eod)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: granting #10 suspension of LCivR 7.1(d) while PPO is in effect; Plaintiff shall apply to file electronically within 14 days; Plaintiff to show cause within 14 days why he should not be sanctioned; hearing set for 3/8/2023 at 10:00 AM at 650 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
February 8, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff Nevin P. Cooper-Keel re Amended Complaint #11 (eod)
February 8, 2023 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Garrett Keel-Worrell filed by Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (eod)
February 8, 2023 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION by defendant Garrett Keel-Worrell [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Garrett Keel-Worrell only] (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C) (Fazio, Sara)
January 18, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Garrett Keel-Worrell for Defendant's Motion and Brief for Sanctions pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 (Fazio, Sara)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Garrett Keel-Worrell re Certificate of Compliance Regarding Word Count #6 , MOTION for summary judgment and Brief in Support for Summary Judgment #5 , Certificate Regarding Motion Concurrence #7 (Fazio, Sara)
January 17, 2023 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION for summary judgment and Brief in Support for Summary Judgment #5 filed by Garrett Keel-Worrell (Fazio, Sara)
January 17, 2023 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION for summary judgment and Brief in Support for Summary Judgment #5 filed by Garrett Keel-Worrell (Fazio, Sara)
January 17, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for summary judgment and Brief in Support for Summary Judgment by defendant Garrett Keel-Worrell; (Fazio, Sara)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed; Garrett Keel-Worrell served on 12/29/2022, answer due 1/19/2023 (eod)
December 30, 2022 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (ns)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (kjw)
December 29, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (eod)
December 29, 2022 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (pjw)
December 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Garrett Keel-Worrell filed by Nevin P. Cooper-Keel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) (eod)
December 28, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED and returned to filer at counter on 12/28/2022 as to defendant Garrett Keel-Worrell (eod) Modified text on 12/29/2022 (eod)
December 28, 2022 RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number 400000048; for civil filing fee (eod)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper-Keel v. Keel-Worrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nevin P. Cooper-Keel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Keel-Worrell
Represented By: Sara Elice-DeWaard Fazio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?