Blocker v. Jonker et al
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER Corey Blocker
Defendant: Robert J. Jonker, Michigan Unemployment Agency, Huntington Bank, H&R Block, Inc., Capital City Apartments and Judith A. Champa
Case Number: 1:2023cv00006
Filed: January 3, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
2 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2023 Copy of Order Rejecting Pleading #15 with original documents sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (eod)
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REJECTING Motions with Exhibit A submitted by Corey Blocker; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document) (sjc)
March 7, 2023 Filing 14 JUDGMENT; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER dismissing case for failure to pay filing fee; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
March 7, 2023 Copy of Judgment #14 , Order Dismissing Case For Failure to Pay Filing Fee Within 28 Days After IFP Was Denied (non-prisoner) #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (eod)
February 16, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for order named as "motion to for a certified copy of every case that has been filed in this court by Corey Blocker to be introduced into evidence under rule 26 of the F.RC.P" by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (ns)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for permanent injunction by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (eod)
February 3, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (eod)
February 1, 2023 Copy of Order Regarding Report and Recommendation, #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (ns)
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #6 ; denying #2 application to proceed in forma pauperis; plaintiff must submit the $402.00 filing fee within 28 days of the date of this order or this action will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 31, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for order named as motion to collateral attack the denial of Corey Blocker in forma pauperis by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ns)
January 25, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for permanent injunction by plaintiff Corey Blocker; (eod)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #2 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
January 6, 2023 Copy of Report and Recommendation #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (eod)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to District Judge Paul L. Maloney for all further proceedings pursuant to Order #4 by Judge Robert J. Jonker ; Judge Robert J. Jonker no longer assigned to case (ns)
January 5, 2023 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case #5 , Order #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (ns)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISQUALIFICATION; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
January 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (jrg)
January 3, 2023 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (jrg)
January 3, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital City Apartments, Judith A. Champa, H&R Block, Inc., Huntington Bank, Robert J. Jonker, Michigan Unemployment Agency filed by Corey Blocker (jrg)
January 3, 2023 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Corey Blocker (jrg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blocker v. Jonker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESTRICTED FILER Corey Blocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Jonker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michigan Unemployment Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H&R Block, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital City Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith A. Champa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?