Abdel-Karim et al v. Blinken et al
Plaintiff: Abrar Abdel-Karim, Qadri Shaheen, Sara Qadri Shaheen, Suad Qadri Shaheen, Talia Qadri Shaheen and Abrar Awad
Defendant: Antony J Blinken, U.S. Department of State, Matthew Paschke, Antony Blinken and Matthew J. Paschke
Case Number: 1:2023cv00031
Filed: January 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08 U.S.C. ยง 1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting unopposed motion for extension of time #7 ; Defendants Antony Blinken and U.S. Department of State's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 4/27/2023; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
March 8, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 or Otherwise Plead #7 filed by Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State (Almassian, Carolyn)
March 8, 2023 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 or Otherwise Plead #7 filed by Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State (Almassian, Carolyn)
March 8, 2023 Filing 7 UNOPPOSED MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 or Otherwise Plead by defendants Antony Blinken, U.S. Department of State; (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order for Extension of Time) (Almassian, Carolyn)
January 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Antony Blinken, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (eod)
January 10, 2023 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Saleh, Noel)
January 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (eod)
January 10, 2023 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Antony Blinken, Matthew J. Paschke, U.S. Department of State (please refer to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) regarding service on the United States and Its Agencies, Corporations, Officers, or Employees) (eod)
January 9, 2023 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Saleh, Noel)
January 9, 2023 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Abrar Abdel-Karim, Qadri Shaheen, Sara Qadri Shahen, Suad Qadri Shaheen, Talia Qadri Shaheen (Saleh, Noel) Modified text on 1/10/2023 (eod)
January 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Abrar Abdel-Karim, Qadri Shaheen, Sara Qadri Shahen, Suad Qadri Shaheen, Talia Qadri Shaheen (Saleh, Noel) Modified text on 1/10/2023 (eod)
January 9, 2023 RECEIPT: in the amount of $402.00, receipt number AMIWDC-6945480; filing fee paid by attorney Noel J. Saleh on behalf of filer (jmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abdel-Karim et al v. Blinken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abrar Abdel-Karim
Represented By: Noel J. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qadri Shaheen
Represented By: Noel J. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Qadri Shaheen
Represented By: Noel J. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suad Qadri Shaheen
Represented By: Noel J. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talia Qadri Shaheen
Represented By: Noel J. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abrar Awad
Represented By: Noel J. Saleh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony J Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of State
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Paschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Represented By: Carolyn Ann Almassian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Paschke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?