Sweezer et al v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Sweezer and Marie Sweezer
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc., BioLife Plasma Services, L.P., BioLife Plasma LLC, Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation also known as Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. doing business as Biolife Plasma Services, Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and Biolife Plasma Services, LP
Case Number: 1:2023cv00073
Filed: January 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2023 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Biolife Plasma Services, LP for Initial Disclosures (Heis, Jennifer)
March 16, 2023 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Jordan Sweezer, Marie Sweezer for Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures and Medical Records (Mills, Benjamin)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 11/16/2023; dispositive motions due by 1/16/2024; settlement conference set for 7/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; final pretrial conference set for 8/5/2024 at 09:00 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; jury trial set for 8/26/2024 at 08:45 AM at 174 Federal Building, Kalamazoo, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
March 9, 2023 Filing 10 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; case management order to issue (Proceedings Not Digitally Recorded) (sjc)
March 9, 2023 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jennifer Snyder Heis on behalf of defendant Biolife Plasma Services, LP (Heis, Jennifer)
March 6, 2023 Filing 9 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Mills, Benjamin)
February 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 3/9/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; status report due by 3/6/2023; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal as to defendants Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. and BioLife Plasma LLC; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
February 6, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE re #3 by defendant Biolife Plasma Services, LP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Plaintiffs' Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Exhibit 2-BioLife Plasma Services L.P.'s Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit 3-Summons Issued to BioLife Plasma Services, L.P.; BioLife Plasma L.L.C. and Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.) (Benoit, Sarah)
January 27, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed as to Biolife Plasma Services, LP waiver sent on 1/26/2023, answer due 3/27/2023 (Mills, Benjamin) Modified text on 1/27/2023 (mlc).
January 25, 2023 Filing 4 STIPULATION of dismissal Without Prejudice by defendant Biolife Plasma Services, LP (Benoit, Sarah)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 20, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
January 19, 2023 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand (as taken from attachment to #1 ) by Biolife Plasma Services, LP (pjw)
January 19, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kent County Circuit Court case number 22-11215 filed by BioLife Plasma Services, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Documents, #2 Exhibit 2-Consents to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 BioLife Plasma Services L.P.'s Answer and Defenses to Plaintiffs' Complaint, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Benoit, Sarah)
January 19, 2023 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant BioLife Plasma Services, L.P. in the amount of $402, receipt number AMIWDC-6956319 (Benoit, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweezer et al v. Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Sweezer
Represented By: Benjamin William Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Sweezer
Represented By: Benjamin William Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioLife Plasma Services, L.P.
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BioLife Plasma LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation also known as Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. doing business as Biolife Plasma Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Takeda Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biolife Plasma Services, LP
Represented By: Jennifer Snyder Heis
Represented By: Sarah Miller Benoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?