Hokenson v. Lansing, City of et al
Plaintiff: David Wayne Hokenson
Defendant: Bryce Dawsey, Jim Smiertka, Erics Refuse Inc. and Lansing, City of
Case Number: 1:2024cv00601
Filed: June 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #16 filed by Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka (Abood, F. Joseph)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #16 filed by Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka (Abood, F. Joseph)
August 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim with brief in support by defendants Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Nails v. King) (Abood, F. Joseph) Modified text on 8/2/2024 (eod)
July 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED UNEXECUTED by US Marshal as to Erics Refuse Inc. (eod)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying as moot #7 motion to dismiss; defendants shall file a responsive pleading or motion to dismiss the amended complaint within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 sent via U.S. Mail to David Wayne Hokenson (eod)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew D. Staples on behalf of defendants Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka (Staples, Matthew)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT (signature taken from #10 ) against Bryce Dawsey, Erics Refuse Inc., Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka filed by David Wayne Hokenson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment A) (eod)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff David Wayne Hokenson for hand service (eod)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition #10 filed by David Wayne Hokenson (eod)
July 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #7 filed by David Wayne Hokenson (eod)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #7 filed by Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka (Hagen-Lawrence, Lisa)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #7 filed by Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka (Hagen-Lawrence, Lisa)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim with brief in support and certificate of service by defendants Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka; (Hagen-Lawrence, Lisa) Modified text on 7/5/2024 (eod)
July 5, 2024 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of F. Joseph Abood on behalf of defendants Bryce Dawsey, Lansing, City of, Jim Smiertka (Abood, F. Joseph)
June 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by US Marshal by personal service of summons and complaint upon Matt Staples for Lansing, City and Jim Smiertka served on 6/14/2024, answer due 7/5/2024 and Lynne Punele for Bryce Dawsey served on 6/14/2024, answer due 7/5/2024 (eod) Modified text on 6/17/2024 (eod)
June 12, 2024 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants and delivered to US Marshal for service (eod)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (fhw)
June 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #4 and Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to David Wayne Hokenson (pjw)
June 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (eod)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (eod)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by David Wayne Hokenson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (eod)
June 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to David Wayne Hokenson (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hokenson v. Lansing, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryce Dawsey
Represented By: Matthew D. Staples
Represented By: Lisa K Hagen-Lawrence
Represented By: F. Joseph Abood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Smiertka
Represented By: Matthew D. Staples
Represented By: Lisa K Hagen-Lawrence
Represented By: F. Joseph Abood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erics Refuse Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing, City of
Represented By: Matthew D. Staples
Represented By: Lisa K Hagen-Lawrence
Represented By: F. Joseph Abood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wayne Hokenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?