Mayes #793413 et al v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Wiley Mayes #793413
Defendant: Unknown Luther, David Maranka, Unknown Shafer, Walton L. Smith, Unknown Saad, Unknown Simon, Jim Dunigan, Sara Heydens, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Heidi Washington, Unknown Bookie, Michelle Norton, John Davids, Jeremy Bush, R. Brokaw, Unknown Bonn and Unknown Preston
Case Number: 1:2024cv00944
Filed: September 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent for all further proceedings pursuant to Consent to Proceed before Magistrate Judge #5 ; Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou no longer assigned to case (slk)
October 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment of Case #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Wiley Mayes (slk)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Unknown Bonn, Unknown Bookie, R. Brokaw, Jeremy Bush, John Davids, Jim Dunigan, Sara Heydens, Unknown Luther, David Maranka, Michelle Norton, Unknown Saad, Unknown Shafer, Unknown Simon, Walton L. Smith, Unknown Part(y)(ies), Heidi Washington, Unknown Preston filed by Wiley Mayes #793413 (slk)
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from #5 ) by plaintiff Wiley Mayes #793413 consenting to proceed before the Magistrate Judge (slk)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF SEVERED CASE (pjw)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Notice (Other) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Wiley Mayes #793413 (eod)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Order #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Alrelio Evans #367619, Nicholas Bailey #970872, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Denzil Bell #770562, Wiley Mayes #793413, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524, Justin Thomas #671685, Xavier Smith #773449, Samuel Bush #576866, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358, Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Keith Darrius Manders #968218 and Joe W. Straws #280558 with amended complaint form (pjw)
September 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER severing case into 16 related cases; directing plaintiffs to file amended complaints; signed by Chief Judge Hala Y. Jarbou (aks)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
September 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #2 sent via U.S. Mail to Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Justin Thomas #671685, Alrelio Evans #367619, Denzil Bell #770562, Keith Darrius Manders #968218, Wiley Mayes #793413, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Samuel Bush #576866, Xavier Smith #773449, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Joe W. Straws #280558, III, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Nicholas Bailey #970872, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358 (klb)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Justin Thomas #671685, Alrelio Evans #367619, Denzil Bell #770562, Keith Darrius Manders #968218, Wiley Mayes #793413, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Samuel Bush #576866, Xavier Smith #773449, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Joe W. Straws #280558, III, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Nicholas Bailey #970872, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (pjw)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number 100005246 for filing fee (pjw)
September 6, 2024 Opinion or Order STATEMENT RE CONSENT (as taken from #1 ) by plaintiffs Nicholas Bailey #970872, Denzil Bell #770562, Samuel Bush #576866, Daniel Carpenter #798562, Elrick Delmar Cooper #190929, Alrelio Evans #367619, Jared Michael Mahler #754926, Keith Darrius Manders #968218, Wiley Mayes #793413, Artavius Jamal McDowell #509775, Diontae Larell Rahman #957358, Marcus Deandre Robinson #268376, Xavier Smith #773449, Joe W. Straws #280558, III, Justin Thomas #671685, Christopher Lee Tyree #855524 requesting the case be assigned to a district judge (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayes #793413 et al v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Luther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Maranka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Shafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Saad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Dunigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Heydens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bookie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Davids
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Brokaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bonn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiley Mayes #793413
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?