Comerica Bank v. Probst et al
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank
Defendant: Malinda Jones and Scott Probst
Counter-Claimant: Malinda Jones and Scott Probst
Counter-Defendant: Comerica Bank
Case Number: 1:2024cv01155
Filed: November 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2024 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT from 60th District Court, of receipt of remanded case (mg)
November 8, 2024 Filing 10 LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to 60th District Court (mg)
November 8, 2024 Copy of Order of Remand (no motion) #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Jessamyne M. Kalabat, Malinda Jones, and Scott Probst (mg)
November 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF REMAND: case remanded to 60th District Court ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 6, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE titled as notice of execution of expungement affidavit by defendant Malinda Jones (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (mg)
November 6, 2024 Filing 7 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by defendant Malinda Jones (mg)
November 5, 2024 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Jessamyne M. Kalabat, Malinda Jones, and Scott Probst (mg)
November 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting defendants leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jln)
November 4, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mg)
November 4, 2024 Filing 4 CASE ASSIGNMENT REVIEW indicating the cases are related ; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (mg)
November 4, 2024 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Jessamyne M. Kalabat, Malinda Jones, and Scott Probst (mg)
November 1, 2024 Filing 3 COUNTERCLAIM against Comerica Bank filed by Scott Probst, Malinda Jones (mg)
November 1, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (mg)
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 60th District Court case number 24-059106-LT filed by Scott Probst, Malinda Jones (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Comerica Bank v. Probst et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malinda Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Malinda Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Scott Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Comerica Bank
Represented By: Jessamyne M. Kalabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comerica Bank
Represented By: Jessamyne M. Kalabat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?