St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC v. True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC
Defendant: GEORGE STEVENSON, STEVEN STEVENSON and True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as True Grit Industries
Case Number: 1:2024cv01291
Filed: December 9, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Ray Kent
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2025 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC re MOTION to strike #7 #12 , #13 , and #14 (Semonin, James) Modified text on 2/4/2025 (eod)
February 3, 2025 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE by plaintiff St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC re Response in Opposition #16 (Semonin, James)
February 3, 2025 Filing 16 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss (in letter format) #7 filed by St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC (Semonin, James)
January 29, 2025 Filing 15 PROOF OF MAILING by plaintiff St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC re Notice Rescheduling Hearing #11 on Defendant George Stevenson (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
January 28, 2025 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE regarding compliance with LCivR 7.1(d) re MOTION to strike #7 #12 filed by St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC (Semonin, James)
January 28, 2025 Filing 13 BRIEF in support of MOTION to strike #7 #12 filed by St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Semonin, James)
January 28, 2025 Filing 12 MOTION to strike #7 by plaintiff St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC; (Semonin, James)
January 28, 2025 Copy of Notice Rescheduling Hearing #11 sent via U.S. Mail to True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC and Steven Stevenson (eod)
January 27, 2025 Filing 11 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 1/30/2025 by video; status conference rescheduled to 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM at 584 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
January 22, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of status conference set for 1/30/2025 at 11:00 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; (fhw)
January 22, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James Grant Semonin on behalf of plaintiff St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC (Semonin, James)
January 22, 2025 Copy of Notice of Hearing #10 sent via U.S. Mail to True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC and Steven Stevenson (eod)
January 16, 2025 Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #8 sent via U.S. Mail to True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC and Steven Stevenson (eod)
January 15, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS returned executed; George Stevenson served on 1/9/2025, answer due 1/30/2025 (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Ray Kent; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
January 13, 2025 Filing 7 MOTION to dismiss (in letter format) by defendants True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC, Steven Stevenson ; (eod)
December 26, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC served on 12/17/2024, answer due 1/7/2025 (Kolkmeyer, Michelle) Modified service/answer date on 12/26/2024 (pjw)
December 10, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC [Attorney J. Adam Behrendt added to party St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC(pty:pla)] (Behrendt, J.)
December 10, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants George Stevenson, Steven Stevenson, True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC (eod)
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (eod)
December 9, 2024 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
December 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by St. Marys Cement U.S. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)
December 9, 2024 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff St. Marys Cement U.S. LLC in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7561475 (Kolkmeyer, Michelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC v. True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE STEVENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN STEVENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: True Grit Oil, Power, Wind, Solar and Broadband Services, LLC a Wyoming limited liability company doing business as True Grit Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Marys Cement U.S., LLC
Represented By: Michelle L. Kolkmeyer
Represented By: James Grant Semonin
Represented By: J. Adam Behrendt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?