Huntington National Bank, The v. RPI Real Estate, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank, The
Defendant: Ralph B. Rogers Trust, RPI Real Estate, LLC, Thomas B. Rogers, Gladys R. Rogers Trust, Rogers Printing, Inc. and Thomas B. Rogers Trust
Receiver: M. Shapiro Management Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01303
Filed: December 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2025 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by RPI Real Estate, LLC (Sierawski, Matthew)
January 27, 2025 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Rogers Printing, Inc. (Sierawski, Matthew)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/24/2025 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; status report due by 2/19/2025; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that defendants RPI Real Estate, LLC and Rogers Printing, Inc. file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 24, 2025 Filing 19 ANSWER to complaint, #1 with affirmative defenses by Thomas B. Rogers Trust, Ralph B. Rogers Trust, Gladys R. Rogers Trust, RPI Real Estate, LLC, Rogers Printing, Inc., Thomas B. Rogers (Sierawski, Matthew) Modified text on 1/24/2025 (pjw)
January 24, 2025 Copy of Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Telephone #21 and Order for Corporate Disclosure Statement #20 sent via U.S. Mail to Mark Kassab (pjw)
January 20, 2025 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by receiver M. Shapiro Management Company, LLC re Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order #7 (Hall, Lisa)
January 10, 2025 Filing 17 NOTICE re #7 Acceptance of Receivership by receiver M. Shapiro Management Company, LLC (Hall, Lisa)
January 10, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lisa A. Hall on behalf of receiver M. Shapiro Management Company, LLC (Hall, Lisa)
January 7, 2025 Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Mark Kassab (pjw)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving STIPULATION #15 ; deadline for defendants to respond to complaint extended to 1/24/2025; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
January 3, 2025 Filing 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by defendants Thomas B. Rogers Trust, Ralph B. Rogers Trust, Gladys R. Rogers Trust, RPI Real Estate, LLC, Rogers Printing, Inc., Thomas B. Rogers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sierawski, Matthew)
January 2, 2025 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Gladys R. Rogers Trust served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (eod)
January 2, 2025 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Ralph B. Rogers Trust served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (eod)
January 2, 2025 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Thomas B. Rogers Trust served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (eod)
January 2, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Thomas B. Rogers served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (eod)
January 2, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to RPI Real Estate, LLC served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (eod)
January 2, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED as to Rogers Printing, Inc. served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (eod)
December 18, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE re #7 Acceptance of Receivership by plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The (Ejbeh, Joseph)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER; approving STIPULATION #6 ; receiver must sign acceptance form; the order terminates on 3/28/2025, the parties may move to extend; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr)
December 17, 2024 Copy of Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Mark Kassab (pjw)
December 16, 2024 Filing 6 EMERGENCY PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER appointing Receiver by plaintiff Huntington National Bank, The (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 12/16/2024 (pjw)
December 13, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Gladys R. Rogers Trust, RPI Real Estate, LLC, Ralph B. Rogers Trust, Thomas B. Rogers, Rogers Printing, Inc., Thomas B. Rogers Trust (pjw)
December 13, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Paul L. Maloney (pjw)
December 13, 2024 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Matthew E. Sierawski on behalf of defendants Thomas B. Rogers Trust, Ralph B. Rogers Trust, Gladys R. Rogers Trust, RPI Real Estate, LLC, Rogers Printing, Inc., Thomas B. Rogers (Sierawski, Matthew)
December 12, 2024 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Ejbeh, Joseph)
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Huntington National Bank, The (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 12/13/2024 (pjw)
December 12, 2024 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT for Foreclosure, Appointment of Receiver and Other Relief against All Defendants filed by Huntington National Bank, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O) (Ejbeh, Joseph) Modified text on 12/13/2024 (pjw)
December 12, 2024 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff The Huntington National Bank in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7564673 (Ejbeh, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huntington National Bank, The v. RPI Real Estate, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph B. Rogers Trust
Represented By: Matthew E. Sierawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RPI Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Matthew E. Sierawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Rogers
Represented By: Matthew E. Sierawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladys R. Rogers Trust
Represented By: Matthew E. Sierawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rogers Printing, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew E. Sierawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas B. Rogers Trust
Represented By: Matthew E. Sierawski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington National Bank, The
Represented By: Joseph N. Ejbeh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: M. Shapiro Management Company, LLC
Represented By: Lisa A. Hall
Represented By: Mark Kassab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?