BMO Bank N.A. v. Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC et al
Plaintiff: BMO Bank N.A.
Defendant: Muzafer Duric and Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01311
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Robert J Jonker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2025 Filing 10 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendants Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC, Muzafer Duric (eod)
February 7, 2025 Filing 9 APPLICATION for entry of default as to Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC and Muzafer Duric (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Haney, James)
January 24, 2025 Filing 8 (DEFAULT NOT ENTERED)(statement regarding defendants are neither minors or incompetent persons not included) APPLICATION for entry of default as to Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC and Muzafer Duric (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Haney, James) Modified text on 1/24/2025 (pjw)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: plaintiff shall request a default or show cause within thirty days of this order; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
January 3, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; Muzafer Duric served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Haney, James)
January 3, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC served on 12/26/2024, answer due 1/16/2025 (Haney, James)
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Muzafer Duric, Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC (eod)
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker (eod)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMO Bank N.A. identifying Corporate Parent BMO Financial Corp. for BMO Bank N.A. (Haney, James)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Muzafer Duric, Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC filed by BMO Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement 1, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement 2, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement 3, #4 Exhibit D - Agreement 4, #5 Exhibit E - Modification Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Guaranties, #7 Summons as to Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC, #8 Summons as to Muzafer Duric) (Haney, James)
December 13, 2024 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff BMO Bank N.A. in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7565786 (Haney, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMO Bank N.A. v. Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMO Bank N.A.
Represented By: James Kevin Haney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muzafer Duric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Eye Truck Lines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?