Perrone v. BCBS Life Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Jacob A. Perrone
Defendant: BCBS Michigan and BCBS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2024cv01313
Filed: December 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Sally J Berens
Referring Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants BCBS Life Insurance Company, BCBS Michigan (eod)
December 30, 2024 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Jacob A. Perrone in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7576598 (Perrone, Jacob)
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (pjw)
December 16, 2024 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants BCBS Michigan, BCBS Life Insurance Company (fee due) (pjw)
December 14, 2024 Filing 1 VERIFIED MHPAEA COMPLAINT against all defendants filed by Jacob Alan Perrone (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons) (Perrone, Jacob) Modified text on 12/16/2024 (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perrone v. BCBS Life Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCBS Michigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCBS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob A. Perrone
Represented By: Jacob Perrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?