Cozart-Lundin et al v. LoanCare, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amy Ruth Cozart-Lundin, Andrea Marie Cozart-Lundin and Cozyartz Media Group, LLC
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC and Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01333
Filed: December 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2025 Copy of Order on Motion to Amend/Correct #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Amy Ruth Cozart-Lundin, Andrea Marie Cozart-Lundin and Cozyartz Media Group, LLC (pjw)
January 23, 2025 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC filed by Cozyartz Media Group, LLC, Amy Ruth Cozart-Lundin, Andrea Marie Cozart-Lundin (pjw)
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing as moot #6 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint; proposed amended complaint is accepted for filing [6-1]; attorney to file an appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Cozyartz Media Group, LLC, within 28 days or a recommendation for dismissal will issue; signed by Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens (jal)
January 22, 2025 Filing 6 MOTION to amend/correct #1 by plaintiffs Amy Ruth Cozart-Lundin, Andrea Marie Cozart-Lundin; (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (eod)
January 22, 2025 RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number 400000272; for civil case filing fee (ems)
January 22, 2025 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC, LoanCare, LLC and mailed to Amy Ruth Cozart-LundinAndrea and Marie Cozart-Lundin (eod) Modified text on 1/22/2025 (eod)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sally J. Berens; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 ; filing fee to be submitted by 1/17/2025; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (lep)
December 20, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (pjw)
December 20, 2024 Copy of Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #4 , Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge #5 , Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Amy Ruth Cozart-Lundin and Andrea Marie Cozart-Lundin (eod)
December 19, 2024 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (pjw)
December 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Amy Ruth Cozart-Lundin, Andrea Marie Cozart-Lundin (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summonses) (pjw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cozart-Lundin et al v. LoanCare, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Ruth Cozart-Lundin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Marie Cozart-Lundin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cozyartz Media Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LoanCare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?