McKay v. Wendorf et al
Plaintiff: Heather McKay
Defendant: Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC, Next Step Home Healthcare LLC, Victoria Wendorf and Nest Step Case Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01357
Filed: December 31, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2025 Filing 14 LETTER, certified copy of remand order and docket sheet sent to 56A District Court, Eaton County Court (mg)
February 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REMAND: case remanded to State Court; ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE #8 without prejudice; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
January 30, 2025 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE re #11 Response Brief by defendants Victoria Wendorf, Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC, Next Step Home Healthcare LLC, Nest Step Case Management, LLC (Clayton, Emily) Modified text on 1/31/2025 (pjw)
January 30, 2025 Filing 11 RESPONSE BRIEF TO #7 Order to Show Cause with certificate of service filed by defendants Victoria Wendorf, Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC, Next Step Home Healthcare LLC, Nest Step Case Management, LLC (Clayton, Emily) Modified text on 1/31/2025 (pjw)
January 17, 2025 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Response in Opposition, #9 filed by Victoria Wendorf, Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC, Next Step Home Healthcare LLC, Nest Step Case Management, LLC (Clayton, Emily)
January 17, 2025 Filing 9 RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to strike Affirmative Defenses #8 filed by Victoria Wendorf, Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC, Next Step Home Healthcare LLC, Nest Step Case Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Reliance on Jury Demand) (Clayton, Emily)
January 3, 2025 Filing 8 MOTION to strike affirmative defenses with brief in support and certificate of service by plaintiff Heather McKay; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (O'Briant, Ina) Modified text on 1/6/2025 (mlc)
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Defendants to show cause by 1/31/2025; signed by Judge Robert J. Jonker (elam)
January 2, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING notice of removal re #1 directed to Plaintiff's Counsel and 56A District Court Clerk by defendants Victoria Wendorf, Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC, Next Step Home Healthcare LLC, Nest Step Case Management, LLC (Clayton, Emily)
January 2, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re notice of filing notice of removal (slk)
December 31, 2024 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Next Step Case Management, LLC (Clayton, Emily) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (slk).
December 31, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Next Step Home Healthcare LLC (Clayton, Emily)
December 31, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC (Clayton, Emily)
December 31, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 56A District Court for Eaton County case number 24-4059-CZ filed by Next Step Home Healthcare LLC, Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC, Victoria Wendorf, Next Step Case Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Records) (Clayton, Emily) Modified text on 1/2/2025 (slk).
December 31, 2024 RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number AMIWDC-7577426; filing fee paid by attorney Emily Meaghan Clayton on behalf of filer (jmw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKay v. Wendorf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Heart Home Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Emily Meaghan Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Next Step Home Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Emily Meaghan Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Wendorf
Represented By: Emily Meaghan Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nest Step Case Management, LLC
Represented By: Emily Meaghan Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather McKay
Represented By: Ina R. O'Briant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?