Perez Aguilar et al v. Chip Seal Michigan, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Domingo Perez Aguilar and Darwin Josue Perez Murillo
Defendant: Donald Burke, John Burke and Chip Seal Michigan, LLC a domestic limited liability company, jointly and severally doing business as ACE Asphalt Chip Seal
Case Number: 1:2025cv00072
Filed: January 20, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Sally J Berens
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; Chip Seal Michigan, LLC served on 3/4/2025, answer due 3/25/2025 (Alvarez, Robert)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Donald Burke, John Burke, Chip Seal Michigan, LLC (ems)
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Alvarez, Robert)
January 22, 2025 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Domingo Perez Aguilar, Darwin Josue Perez Murillo in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7595343 (Alvarez, Robert)
January 22, 2025 RECEIPT: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number AMIWDC-7595337; for filing fee paid by attorney Robert Alvarez (klb)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (ems)
January 21, 2025 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Chip Seal Michigan, LLC, Donald Burke, John Burke (filing fee not paid and proposed summonses have not been provided by the filing party) (ems)
January 20, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald Burke, John Burke, Chip Seal Michigan, LLC filed by Domingo Perez Aguilar, Darwin Josue Perez Murillo (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alvarez, Robert) Modified text and filers on 1/21/2025 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez Aguilar et al v. Chip Seal Michigan, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo Perez Aguilar
Represented By: Robert Anthony Alvarez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darwin Josue Perez Murillo
Represented By: Robert Anthony Alvarez, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chip Seal Michigan, LLC a domestic limited liability company, jointly and severally doing business as ACE Asphalt Chip Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?