Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund et al v. Serratos Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund and Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Defendant: Serratos Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00077
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Phillip J Green
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2025 Opinion or Order (NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER REFERRING MOTION for alternate service #5 and PROPOSED ORDER #7 to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green under 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
March 14, 2025 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiffs Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund re Brief in Support of a Motion, #6 , MOTION for alternate service #5 , PROPOSED ORDER regarding Alternative Service by plaintiffs Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons Internati #7 (Calati, Hope)
March 14, 2025 Filing 7 PROPOSED ORDER regarding Alternative Service by plaintiffs Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund (Calati, Hope)
March 14, 2025 Filing 6 BRIEF in support of MOTION for alternate service #5 filed by Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund (Calati, Hope)
March 14, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION for alternate service by plaintiffs Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund; (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A) (Calati, Hope)
January 22, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant Serratos Construction, Inc. (ems)
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (ems)
January 21, 2025 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Calati, Hope)
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund (Calati, Hope) Modified text on 1/22/2025 (ems).
January 21, 2025 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund, Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund, Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7594053 (Calati, Hope) Modified text on 1/22/2025 (ems).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund et al v. Serratos Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serratos Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Pension Fund
Represented By: Hope L. Calati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Outstate Michigan Trowel Trades Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Hope L. Calati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of Operative Plasterers and Cement Masons International Association Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Hope L. Calati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?