Private Financing Alternatives, LLC v. Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Private Financing Alternatives, LLC
Defendant: WALLOON LAKE HOLDINGS, LLC, MATTHEW ALLEN BORISCH, JONATHAN L. BORISCH, MARY K. BORISCH, JLB RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, LLC and HOTEL WALLOON, LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00165
Filed: February 12, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Hala Y Jarbou
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2025 Filing 20 MOTION to strike #18 Affirmative Defenses to the Complaint by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC; (Solomon, Stanford)
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference: Rule 16 scheduling conference is set for 5/29/2025 at 02:30 PM by video before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 5/22/2025; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat. Video conference information at the end of this order. (cam)
April 3, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Samuel P. Mauch on behalf of plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC Co-Counsel (Mauch, Samuel)
April 3, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Brian Witus on behalf of plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC Co-Counsel (Witus, Brian)
March 28, 2025 Filing 18 AMENDED ANSWER to complaint #16 and Affirmative Defenses filed by defendants Matthew Allen Borisch, Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC, Matthew Allen Borisch, Jonathan L. Borisch, Mary K. Borisch, JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC, Hotel Walloon, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Index J) (Gates, Floyd)
March 11, 2025 Filing 17 NOTICE re #5 of Filing Certified Copy of Notice of Lis Pendens by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Recorded Certified Copy of Notice of Lis Pendens) (Solomon, Stanford)
March 10, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Cameron D. Ritsema on behalf of defendants Matthew Allen Borisch, Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC, Matthew Allen Borisch, Jonathan L. Borisch, Mary K. Borisch, JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC, Hotel Walloon, LLC (Ritsema, Cameron)
March 10, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James Grant Semonin on behalf of defendants Matthew Allen Borisch, Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC, Matthew Allen Borisch, Jonathan L. Borisch, Mary K. Borisch, JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC, Hotel Walloon, LLC (Semonin, James)
March 7, 2025 Filing 16 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses by Matthew Allen Borisch (as trustee of Matthew Allen Borisch trust under an agreement dated Sept. 19, 2006), Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC, Matthew Allen Borisch, Jonathan L. Borisch, Mary K. Borisch, JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC, Hotel Walloon, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Gates, Floyd) Modified text on 3/10/2025 (ems).
March 7, 2025 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC [Attorney Floyd E. Gates, Jr added to party Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)] (Gates, Floyd)
March 7, 2025 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC [Attorney Floyd E. Gates, Jr added to party JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)] (Gates, Floyd)
March 7, 2025 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hotel Walloon, LLC [Attorney Floyd E. Gates, Jr added to party Hotel Walloon, LLC(pty:dft)] (Gates, Floyd)
February 18, 2025 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC re Summons Issued #4 defendant Matthew Allen Borisch Trust UAD Sept. 19, 2006 served on 2/17/25; answer due 3/10/25 (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/20/2025 (mg).
February 18, 2025 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC re Summons Issued #4 defendant Matthew Allen Borisch served on 2/17/25; answer due 3/10/25 (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/20/2025 (mg).
February 18, 2025 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC re Summons Issued #4 defendant Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC served on 2/14/25; answer due 3/7/25 (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/20/2025 (mg).
February 18, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC re Summons Issued #4 defendant Mary K. Borisch served on 2/14/25; answer due 3/7/25 (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/20/2025 (mg).
February 18, 2025 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC re Summons Issued #4 defendant Jonathan L. Borisch served on 2/14/25; answer due 3/7/25 (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/20/2025 (mg).
February 18, 2025 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC re Summons Issued #4 defendant JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC served on 2/14/25; answer due 3/7/25 (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/20/2025 (mg).
February 18, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC re Summons Issued #4 defendant Hotel Walloon, LLC served on 2/14/25; answer due 3/7/25 (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/20/2025 (mg).
February 14, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Solomon, Stanford)
February 14, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Jonathan L. Borisch, Mary K. Borisch, Matthew Allen Borisch, Matthew Allen Borisch, Hotel Walloon, LLC, JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC, Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC (mg)
February 14, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Hala Y. Jarbou (mg)
February 13, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Robert G. May on behalf of plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC (May, Robert)
February 12, 2025 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re #1 by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Disclosure Statement) (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/14/2025 (mg).
February 12, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Private Financing Alternatives, LLC (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Summons Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC, #11 Summons Matthew Allen Borisch As Trustee of Matthew Allen Borisch Trust under an agreement dated Sept. 19, 2006, #12 Summons Matthew Allen Borisch, #13 Summons Jonathan L. Borisch, #14 Summons Mary K. Borisch, #15 Summons JLB Restaurant Holdings, LLC, #16 Summons Hotel Walloon, LLC) (Solomon, Stanford) Modified text on 2/14/2025 (mg).
February 12, 2025 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Private Financing Alternatives, LLC in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7616885 (Solomon, Stanford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Private Financing Alternatives, LLC v. Walloon Lake Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Private Financing Alternatives, LLC
Represented By: Stanford Solomon
Represented By: Samuel P. Mauch
Represented By: Robert G. May
Represented By: Brian Witus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALLOON LAKE HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: James Grant Semonin
Represented By: Floyd E. Gates, Jr.
Represented By: Cameron D. Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW ALLEN BORISCH
Represented By: James Grant Semonin
Represented By: Floyd E. Gates, Jr.
Represented By: Cameron D. Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN L. BORISCH
Represented By: James Grant Semonin
Represented By: Floyd E. Gates, Jr.
Represented By: Cameron D. Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY K. BORISCH
Represented By: James Grant Semonin
Represented By: Floyd E. Gates, Jr.
Represented By: Cameron D. Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JLB RESTAURANT HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: James Grant Semonin
Represented By: Floyd E. Gates, Jr.
Represented By: Cameron D. Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOTEL WALLOON, LLC
Represented By: James Grant Semonin
Represented By: Floyd E. Gates, Jr.
Represented By: Cameron D. Ritsema
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?