Liggins v. YWCA West Central Michigan et al
Plaintiff: Malaika Liggins
Defendant: YWCA West Central Michigan, Amy Loyd, Eileen McKeever and Young Women
Case Number: 1:2025cv00169
Filed: February 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Jane M Beckering
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2025 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by YWCA West Central Michigan (O'Rourke, Matthew)
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Defendant YWCA West Central Michigan file a corporate disclosure statement within 7 days; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
April 8, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting STIPULATION #6 ; Defendant YWCA West Central Michigan's answer or other responsive pleading due 4/28/2025; signed by District Judge Jane M. Beckering (rmw)
April 7, 2025 Filing 6 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by defendant YWCA West Central Michigan [Attorney Matthew M. O'Rourke added to party YWCA West Central Michigan(pty:dft)] (O'Rourke, Matthew)
March 21, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; All Defendants (Alvarez, Robert)
February 14, 2025 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Amy Loyd, Eileen McKeever, YWCA West Central Michigan (mlc)
February 14, 2025 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned to Jane M. Beckering (mlc)
February 13, 2025 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (Alvarez, Robert)
February 13, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and jury demand against All Defendants filed by Malaika Liggins (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Alvarez, Robert) Modified text on 2/14/2025 (mlc)
February 13, 2025 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Malaika Liggins in the amount of $405, receipt number AMIWDC-7617819 (Alvarez, Robert)
February 13, 2025 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Victor Manuel Jimenez, Jr on behalf of plaintiff Malaika Liggins (Jimenez, Victor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liggins v. YWCA West Central Michigan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malaika Liggins
Represented By: Robert Anthony Alvarez, Sr.
Represented By: Victor Manuel Jimenez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YWCA West Central Michigan
Represented By: Matthew M. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Loyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eileen McKeever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Women
Represented By: Matthew M. O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?