Denofre v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Rebecca Suzanne Denofre
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company, Darlene Korpi, Julie Johnson, Janet LaJoie, Sean Geary and Susan Johnson
Case Number: 2:2018cv00132
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
County: Marquette
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2018 Certified Copy of Opinion #6 , Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED; denying #5 motion to appoint counsel; case closed; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
August 15, 2018 Filing 6 OPINION; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Rebecca Suzanne Denofre; (mlc)
August 7, 2018 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
August 6, 2018 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
August 3, 2018 COMPLAINT RECEIVED; IFP Decision Pending (mlc)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Rebecca Suzanne Denofre; (mlc)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Rebecca Suzanne Denofre (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denofre v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Suzanne Denofre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Korpi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet LaJoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?