Stengard v. First National Bank of Omaha
Plaintiff: Rachel Stengard
Defendant: First National Bank and First National Bank of Omaha
Case Number: 2:2018cv00183
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that docket text for Case Management Order, #13 was incorrect and should be disregarded. Please see entry #14 . (cam)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 5/15/2019; dispositive motions due by 5/22/2019; settlement conference and final pretrial conference set for 10/2/2019 at 01:30 PM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley; jury trial set for 10/21/2019 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
December 19, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) NOTICE that the wrong document was attached to the Case Management Order entry, #12 and should be disregarded. See entry #13 for the correct order (cam)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 (DISREGARD) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 10/18/2019; dispositive motions due by 11/13/2019; settlement conference set for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley; final pretrial conference set for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley; jury trial set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) Modified on 12/20/2018 - the text in this entry is incorrect. See order #14 (cam).
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 (DISREGARD) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 10/18/2019; dispositive motions due by 11/13/2019; settlement conference and final pretrial conference set for 6/2/2020 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley; jury trial set for 6/15/2020 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before Judge Gordon J. Quist; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) Modified on 12/19/2018 - wrong document attached (cam).
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTES of scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Proceedings Not Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Weiss, Jordan)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 12/19/2018 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley; status report due by 12/17/2018 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by First National Bank of Omaha (Rooney, Cory)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #4 with affirmative defenses by First National Bank of Omaha (Rooney, Cory) Modified text on 11/20/2018 (mlc).
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS returned executed; First National Bank of Omaha served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/26/2018 (Weiss, Jordan)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant First National Bank of Omaha (mlc)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against First National Bank of Omaha filed by Rachel Stengard (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended, #2 Summons) (Weiss, Jordan)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant First National Bank (mlc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (mlc)
October 23, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Rachel Stengard in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4271739 (Weiss, Jordan)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against First National Bank filed by Rachel Stengard (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Weiss, Jordan) Modified text on 10/24/2018 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stengard v. First National Bank of Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank
Represented By: Cory J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: Cory J. Rooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Stengard
Represented By: Jordan Zachary Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?