Swanson Flo, Co. v. Koontz Electric Company, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Swanson Flo, Co.
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Koontz Electric Company, Inc. and Neicers, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00184
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
0 Judge: Timothy P Greeley
1 Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION of dismissal by plaintiff Swanson Flo, Co. (Reddall, John)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company re Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order #6 (Nastoff, Jeremy)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting STIPULATION #5 to extend answer due ddl to 11/28/2018 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER by defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Koontz Electric Company, Inc., Neicers, LLC [Attorney Jeremy John Nastoff added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy John Nastoff added to party Koontz Electric Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jeremy John Nastoff added to party Neicers, LLC(pty:dft)] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service) (Nastoff, Jeremy)
October 29, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of David Richard Mortensen on behalf of plaintiff Swanson Flo, Co. (Mortensen, David)
October 29, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of James J. Kretsch on behalf of plaintiff Swanson Flo, Co. (Kretsch, James)
October 29, 2018 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of John David Reddall on behalf of plaintiff Swanson Flo, Co. (Reddall, John)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Koontz Electric Company, Inc., Neicers, LLC (mlc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (mlc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Swanson Flo, Co. (Hudson, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2018 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Swanson Flo, Co. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4272906 (Hudson, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Swanson Flo, Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Summons Hartford, #8 Summons Koontz, #9 Summons Neicers) (Hudson, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swanson Flo, Co. v. Koontz Electric Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeremy John Nastoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koontz Electric Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeremy John Nastoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neicers, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy John Nastoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swanson Flo, Co.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Hudson
Represented By: David Richard Mortensen
Represented By: John David Reddall
Represented By: James J. Kretsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?