Stephens #932536 v. MacLaren
Plaintiff: William Chance Stephens #932536
Defendant: Warden Duncan MacClaren
Respondent: Duncan MacLaren
Case Number: 2:2018cv00197
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Paul L Maloney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 12/7/2018 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam)
November 5, 2018 RECEIPT: in the amount of $5.00 by attorney Timothy Doman on behalf of petitioner, receipt number 0646-4282233; for filing fee (mkc)
November 5, 2018 (DISREGARD) RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number 0646-4282233 (kvt) Modified text on 11/20/2018; duplicate entry (kvt).
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney and Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re filing fee (slk)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus filed by William Chance Stephens #932536 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum, #2 Appendix A, #3 Appendix B, #4 Appendix C, #5 Appendix D, #6 Appendix E, #7 Appendix F, #8 Appendix G) (Doman, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephens #932536 v. MacLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Duncan MacClaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chance Stephens #932536
Represented By: Timothy A. Doman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Duncan MacLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?