Goldman #542675 v. Horton
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Lance Adam Goldman #542675
Respondent: Connie Horton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00036
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Gordon J Quist
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2019 USCA CASE NUMBER 19-1187 assigned to second/successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 filed by Lance Adam Goldman #542675 (slk)
February 22, 2019 Certified Copy of Order Transferring Case to CCA (Habeas) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Lance Adam Goldman (mlc)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS CASE to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as second/successive; signed by Judge Gordon J. Quist (Judge Gordon J. Quist, jmt)
February 6, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Assignment of Case #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Lance Adam Goldman (slk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist and Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (slk)
February 6, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Lance Adam Goldman (slk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10160; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (kvt)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Amending Case Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Lance Adam Goldman. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/6/2019.]
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Lance Adam Goldman against G.Robert Cotton Facility. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 2/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldman #542675 v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RESTRICTED FILER Lance Adam Goldman #542675
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?