Duquette v. Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Ronald Duquette
Defendant: Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00044
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Gordon J Quist
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (McLeod, Peter)
March 15, 2019 Filing 6 CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter Colin McLeod counsel for defendant Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (McLeod, Peter)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-024, Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley is no longer assigned to the case (kvt)
March 11, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Peter Colin McLeod on behalf of defendant Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (McLeod, Peter)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald Duquette as to Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company waiver sent on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/15/2019 (Thompson, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of service sent to The Corporation Company, 40600 Ann Arbor Road E, Suite 201, Plymouth MI 48170-4675 on 02/13/2019 by plaintiff Ronald Duquette waiver of service due by 3/15/2019 (Thompson, Robert)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (mlc)
February 13, 2019 SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendant Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company (Summons Not Provided) (mlc)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company filed by Ronald Duquette (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Robert)
February 12, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Ronald Duquette in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4361414 (Thompson, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duquette v. Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Superior & Ishpeming Railroad Company
Represented By: Peter Colin McLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Duquette
Represented By: Robert B. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?