Vega #974626 v. Horton

Petitioner: Ulises Corrales Vega #974626
Respondent: Connie Horton
Case Number: 2:2019cv00061
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy P Greeley
Referring Judge: Janet T Neff
2 Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number MQ005815 (ndj)
March 15, 2019 Copy of Notice Regarding Reassignment (TPG), #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Ulises Corrales Vega #974626 (kvt)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE that this case is now referred to Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat under #Administrative Order No. 19-CA-024, Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley is no longer assigned to the case (kvt)
March 13, 2019 Copy of Order Denying IFP (Able to Pay - Habeas) #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Ulises Corrales Vega (mlc)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING IFP: petitioner to pay the entire fee of $5.00 within 28 days (filing fee to be submitted by 4/9/2019) or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, rmw)
March 7, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Ulises Corrales Vega (mlc)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:19-cv-10554; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Ulises Corrales Vega. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/6/2019.]
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Ulises Corrales Vega against Connie Horton. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 3/6/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega #974626 v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ulises Corrales Vega #974626
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?