Bowden et al v. DeBroux et al
Plaintiff: Brooke Bowden and Michael Bowden
Defendant: William DeBroux and J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00141
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of telephone status conference set for 1/27/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (will include discussion re: ADR) (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, cam)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: discovery to be completed by 3/2/2020; dispositive motions due by 4/1/2020; settlement conference and final pretrial conference set for 4/16/2020 at 01:30 PM at Marquette, MI before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; jury trial set for 5/4/2020 at 09:00 AM at Marquette, MI before District Judge Paul L. Maloney; ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, cam)
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTES of Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone held before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Proceedings Not Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, cam)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT STATUS REPORT (Stupak, Trenton)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 8/12/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 8/8/2019 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, cam)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 10, 2019 Remark - Please Disregard the Notice of Deficiency portion of Notice #2 ; Notice of Filing Notice of Removal is found at the end of the Notice of Removal #1 (mlc)
July 9, 2019 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand as taken from the Notice of Removal Exhibit C by William DeBroux, J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (mlc)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re notice of filing notice of removal (mlc)
July 9, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4479866 (Beckwith, Dirk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delta County Circuit Court case number 19-24204-NI filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Debroux William (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C - Summons, Complaint, Answer) (Beckwith, Dirk) Modified text on 7/9/2019 (mlc). Modified on 7/9/2019 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowden et al v. DeBroux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William DeBroux
Represented By: Dirk H. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Dirk H. Beckwith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Bowden
Represented By: Trenton Matthew Stupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bowden
Represented By: Trenton Matthew Stupak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?