Collegnon v. Lund et al
Plaintiff: Casey L. Collegnon
Defendant: Stephen D. Lund and Fresh From The Farm Greenhouses, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00164
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Stipulated Order to Remand Case by defendants Fresh from the Farm Greenhouses, LLC, Stephen D. Lund (Navarre, David)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 10/29/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 10/24/2019 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
September 3, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jessica A. Bray on behalf of plaintiff Casey L. Collegnon (Bray, Jessica)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fresh from the Farm Greenhouses, LLC, Stephen D. Lund (Navarre, David)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker ; with NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re corporate disclosure statement (mlc)
August 23, 2019 RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number KZ003928; for Filing fee (mg)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Schoolcraft County Circuit Court case number 19-5375-NI filed by Fresh From The Farm Greenhouses, LLC, Stephen D. Lund (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A-Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B-Articles of Organization, #4 Exhibit C-Proof of Service) (Navarre, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collegnon v. Lund et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen D. Lund
Represented By: David J. Navarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresh From The Farm Greenhouses, LLC
Represented By: David J. Navarre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey L. Collegnon
Represented By: Jessica A. Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?