Pearson v. National Recovery Agency, Inc.
Plaintiff: Patresha Pearson
Defendant: National Recovery Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00171
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS returned executed; National Recovery Agency, Inc. served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019 (Agruss, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 7 DEFAULT ENTERED as to defendant National Recovery Agency, Inc. (mlc)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for entry of default as to National Recovery Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Agruss, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS returned executed; National Recovery Agency, Inc. served on 9/4/2019, answer due 9/25/2019 (Agruss, Michael)
September 4, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Patresha Pearson (Agruss, Michael)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendant National Recovery Agency, Inc. (slk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Robert J. Jonker (slk)
August 29, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiff Patresha Pearson in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4523700 (Agruss, Michael)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Recovery Agency, Inc. filed by Patresha Pearson (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Agruss, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. National Recovery Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Recovery Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patresha Pearson
Represented By: Michael S. Agruss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?