O'Connor v. Chatfield et al
Plaintiff: Thomas P. O'Connor
Defendant: Megan K. Cavanagh, Lucas Middleton, Brian K. Zahra, Robert L. Stratton, Marjorie Hank, Richard Bernstein, Marty Spaulding, Stephen J. Markman, Lee Chatfield, Bridget Mary McCormack, James P. Lambros, Elizabeth T. Clement, Unknown Part(y)(ies), David F. Viviano, Chippewa, County of and James W. Robinson
Case Number: 2:2019cv00218
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for Brief in Support of a Motion,,, #35 filed by Marty Spaulding (Middleton, Lucas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 35 BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #34 filed by Marty Spaulding (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1 - Foreclosure Judgment, #3 Exhibit 2 - O'Connor Motion, #4 Exhibit 3 - Treasurer Response, #5 Exhibit 4 - Trial Court Transcript, #6 Exhibit 5 - Order Denying Motion, #7 Exhibit 6 - First COA Denial, #8 Exhibit 7 - Delayed Application for Leave to Appeal, #9 Exhibit 8 - Treasurer's Response to Application, #10 Exhibit 9 - Second COA Denial, #11 Exhibit 10 - Plaintiff's MSC Application, #12 Exhibit 11 - Treasurer MSC Response, #13 Exhibit 12 - MSC Order) (Middleton, Lucas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction by defendant Marty Spaulding; (Middleton, Lucas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION local rule 7.1(d) answer to middleton esq by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 9, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of compliance re word count for MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim #31 filed by Chippewa, County of, Marjorie Hank (Vander Laan, Allan)
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by defendants Chippewa, County of, Marjorie Hank; (Attachments: #1 Attachment Brief in Support, #2 Index List of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N) (Vander Laan, Allan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 30 EXHIBIT E13-b-3 USCODE-2010-title18-partI-chap21-sec401-CHAPTER 21CONTEMP Power of court. Contempts constituting crimes.pdf by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 29 EXHIBIT E13 b-1-USCODE-2010-title18-partI-chap13-sec241-Conspiracy against rights by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 28 EXHIBIT E13 b-1-USCODE-2010-title18-partI-chap13-sec241-Conspiracy against rights. by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 27 EXHIBIT E13 -a- USCODE-2010-title18-partI-chap11-sec208-208. Acts affecting a personal financial interest by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 26 EXHIBIT E12 Pro Se Supreme Court Motion by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 25 EXHIBIT E9a- Bank records showing ability to pay in full during January phone call. by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 EXHIBIT E8-January proof of Phone with the Treasurer by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 23 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor E6 Bipolar opiode medical report (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Attorney complaint James W. Robinson P26171-70-141 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Attorney complaint James W. Robinson P26171-1-69 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Attorney complaint Lucas Middleton P79493-70-141 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Attorney complaint Lucas Middleton P79493-1-69 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 STATEMENT OF CASE by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Judicial Complaint James P Lambros P62099-70-142 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Judicial Complaint James P Lambros P62099-1-69 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF CLAIM by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Attorney complaint Robert L. Stratton P66995-70 to 141 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT OF CASE by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor Grievance of Robert Stratton p66995 (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 EXHIBIT E1-E3 by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for Reconsideration (Property Tax Payment Confirmation) filed by Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (slk).
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT in support of Motion for Reconsideration for Mike Lebow filed by Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (slk).
December 5, 2019 MOTION for reconsideration re #6 , #7 (as taken from #11 ) by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor; (slk)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in opposition to MOTION for order for immediate stay from November 1, 2019 Auction (as taken from #1 ), MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically (with supporting document #4 ) #9 filed by Thomas P. O'Connor (O'Connor, Thomas)
November 22, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Lucas Vincent Middleton on behalf of defendant Marty Spaulding (Middleton, Lucas)
November 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chippewa, County of, Marjorie Hank, Marty Spaulding and delivered to US Marshal for service (slk)
November 8, 2019 Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File and Receive Notice Electronically #10 , Opinion #6 , Order #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas P. O'Connor (slk)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 motion for leave to file and receive notice electronically; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat, rbk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 PRO SE MOTION for leave to file and receive service electronically (with supporting document #4 ) by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miscellaneous Attachments) (slk)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re complaint, #1 (Proposed Summons) by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (slk)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for partial dismissal and for service; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
October 30, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas P. O'Connor (slk)
October 29, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas P. O'Connor (slk)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
October 28, 2019 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Thomas P. O'Connor (mlc)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
October 25, 2019 MOTION for order for immediate stay from November 1, 2019 Auction (as taken from #1 ) by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor; (slk) Modified filing date on 10/29/2019 (slk).
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE APPLICATION for electronic filing and service by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor (mlc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Thomas P. O'Connor; (mlc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants filed by Thomas P. O'Connor named as, "Immediate Stay from November 1, 2019 Auction"(Attachments: #1 Evidence, #2 Evidence (Continued), #3 Evidence (Continued)) (mlc) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Chatfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan K. Cavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Zahra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie Hank
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Spaulding
Represented By: Lucas Vincent Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Markman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Chatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bridget Mary McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Lambros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth T. Clement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Part(y)(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David F. Viviano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chippewa, County of
Represented By: Allan C. Vander Laan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas P. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?