Corlett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Corlett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2019cv00219
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS returned executed by US Marshal on Commissioner of Social Security, US Attorney and US Attorney General; service upon defendant, Commissioner of Social Security complete on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020 (slk)
November 5, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and delivered to US Marshal for service (slk)
November 5, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Jeffrey D. Corlett (slk)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Jeffrey D. Corlett; (slk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Jeffrey D. Corlett (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miscellaneous Attachments) (slk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Corlett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Corlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?