Marjamaa v. France et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ross Marjamaa
Defendant: Jillian Sadler, Robert Stratton, James P. Lambros, Eric Blubaugh and Jennifer France
Case Number: 2:2019cv00232
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Filing 21 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 91st Judicial District Court; Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Preliminary Examination Transcripts) (mlc)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 ("Brief") by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Letter from Kathy Nickerson) (mlc)
January 14, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 50th Judicial Circuit Court; Pretrial Hearing Transcript) (mlc)
January 8, 2020 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Attachment R) (slk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Miscellaneous Attachments) (slk)
January 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa; (slk)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Chippewa County Case Register of Actions) (mlc)
December 13, 2019 RECEIPT (Prisoner Litigation): filing fee installment in the amount of $74.17, receipt number GR068987; amount paid to date $74.17 (mkc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 photo attachments) (slk)
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Exhibit) (slk)
December 2, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (mlc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Letter to Regional Administrator) (mlc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER from plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa regarding pleading for Attorney's help (Attachments: #1 Letter to Attorney with Notice to Appear) (mlc)
November 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Chippewa County Sheriff's Office forms with Notice to Appear) (mlc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc)
November 18, 2019 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Jeremy Ross Marjamaa and the Chippewa County Jail (mlc) Modified text on 12/3/2019 (mlc).
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re Complaint with Magistrate Referral #1 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (mlc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Jeremy Ross Marjamaa; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with magistrate referral against All Defendants filed by Jeremy Ross Marjamaa (Attachments: #1 Miscellaneous Attachments) (mlc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marjamaa v. France et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jillian Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James P. Lambros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Blubaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Ross Marjamaa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?