Wilson, et al v. Jones, et al
Plaintiff: Ginger Wilson, Brandi Wilson and James Wilson
Defendant: David Allen Jones and PML Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00257
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE rescheduling hearing that was previously set for 2/20/2020; telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/24/2020 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; (cam)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Rule 16 scheduling conference by telephone: telephone Rule 16 scheduling conference set for 2/20/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat; status report due by 2/18/2020 ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. re Exhibit #3 , Notice of Removal #1 (Groustra, Timothy)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. re Exhibit #3 , Answer to Complaint (Petition for Removal) #2 , Notice of Removal #1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement #4 (Groustra, Timothy)
January 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (slk)
December 18, 2019 FILING FEE PAID re #1 by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number AMIWDC-4712181 (Groustra, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE regarding reassignment of case from Southern Division (1:19-cv-1058) to Northern Division per Administrative Order 11-035; all future fillings should reflect the NEW CASE NUMBER of (2:19-cv-257) (ndj) Modified text on 12/18/2019 (slk).
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Amended EXHIBIT re #1 by defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Amended) to Notice of Removal) (Groustra, Timothy)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to complaint #1 with affirmative defenses and jury demand by David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
December 16, 2019 (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Timothy S. Groustra on behalf of defendants David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Groustra, Timothy)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Gogebic County Circuit Court case number 19-231-NI filed by David Allen Jones, PML Trucking, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Index Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Groustra, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson, et al v. Jones, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ginger Wilson
Represented By: Vincent R. Petrucelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Wilson
Represented By: Vincent R. Petrucelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: Vincent R. Petrucelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Allen Jones
Represented By: Timothy S. Groustra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PML Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S. Groustra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?