Allen #227969 v. Brown
Petitioner: Melvin Tim Allen #227969
Respondent: Mike Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv00087
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Alter Judgment #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Melvin Tim Allen (slk)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 motion to alter judgment; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Melvin Tim Allen #227969 re MOTION to alter judgment #7 (slk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to alter judgment by petitioner Melvin Tim Allen #227969; (slk)
July 7, 2020 Certified Copy of Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #6 , Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #5 , Opinion (Screening) #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Melvin Tim Allen (slk)
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying certificate of appealability and DENYING Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel #2 ; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION; Order and Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Melvin Tim Allen #227969 re MOTION to appoint counsel #2 , Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 (mlc)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to appoint counsel by petitioner Melvin Tim Allen #227969; (mlc)
June 18, 2020 RECEIPT: filing fee in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number MQ006110 (mlc)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for writ of habeas corpus named as, "emergency petition for writ of habeas corpus, application for temporary restraining order, complaint for injunctive relief for immediate release" filed by Melvin Tim Allen #227969 (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix D) (mlc) Modified text on 6/19/2020; no appendix C was enclosed (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen #227969 v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Melvin Tim Allen #227969
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?