Ali #462773 v. Stranlay et al
Plaintiff: Omar Khattim Ali #462773
Defendant: Alexsandra Wilionowski, Marie Bennet, Melody Chapin, Connie Horton and Ressie Stranlay
Case Number: 2:2020cv00101
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Copy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #10 , Opinion (Screening) #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Omar Khattim Ali (mlc)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $400.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPINION; Order to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 1, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Omar Khattim Ali (slk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-10242; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
June 29, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #6 Transferring Case to Western District of Michigan on Omar Ali, Pris No. 462773, MACOMB CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 34625 26 MILE ROAD, NEW HAVEN, MI 48048 (RLou) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Linda V. Parker. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 Claim Injury filed by Omar Khattim Ali (SOso) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Omar Ali against Marie Bennet, Melondy Chapin, Connie Horton, Reesie Stranlay, Alexsandra Wilonski. [No New Parties] (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (KCas) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Omar Ali. (KBro) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Omar Ali against All Defendants (KBro) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/1/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali #462773 v. Stranlay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexsandra Wilionowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Bennet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Chapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ressie Stranlay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Khattim Ali #462773
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?