Davis #227488 v. Horton
Petitioner: Earvin R. Davis #227488
Respondent: Connie Horton
Case Number: 2:2020cv00121
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Certified Copy of Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #10 , Opinion (Screening) #8 , Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Earvin R. Davis (mlc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying certificate of appealability and denying #3 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
July 16, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Earvin R. Davis (slk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 1:20-cv-11549; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER SUMMARILY DENYING IN PART THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, DECLINING TO ISSUE A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY OR LEAVE TO APPEAL IN FORMA PAUPERIS, AND TRANSFERRING IN PART THE PETITION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF MICHIGAN Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (SSch) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 MOTION to waive fees re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Earvin R. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge R. Steven Whalen. (DAll) Modified on 7/15/2020 (KWin). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.] Modified text on 7/16/2020 (mlc).
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Earvin R. Davis. (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.] Modified text on 7/16/2020 (mlc).
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to waive fees re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Earvin R. Davis. (LGra) Modified on 7/15/2020 (KWin). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.] Modified text on 7/16/2020 (mlc).
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Earvin R. Davis against Connie Horton. (LGra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (LGra). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.] Modified text on 7/16/2020 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis #227488 v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Connie Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earvin R. Davis #227488
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?