Richards #641715 v. Whitmer et al
Plaintiff: Kyle B. Richards #641715
Defendant: Kristopher Taskila, Gretchen Whitmer, Heidi Washington and Unknown Perttu
Case Number: 2:2020cv00122
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and an investigation (mailed docket sheet showing when documents were filed) (slk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and a list of cases (mailed docket sheet and a list of cases) (slk)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 re MOTION to expedite preliminary screening as life is in immeidate danger #8 , Supplement #9 (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 regarding forms (mailed forms to plaintiff) (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re complaint #1 named as, "notice of exhaustion of state remedies" by plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715 (mlc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to expedite preliminary screening as life is in immediate danger by plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715; (mlc) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (mlc).
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Kyle B. Richards #641715; (Attachments: #1 Form Request (forms mailed to Plaintiff)) (slk)
July 29, 2020 Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Initial Fee Due When Funds Are Available - Prisoner, #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle B. Richards (slk)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff to pay an initial partial fee of $2.20 when funds are available; plaintiff to make interim payments until the full fee is paid ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
July 16, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle B. Richards (slk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11805; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kyle Brandon Richards. (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kyle Brandon Richards against Perttu, Kris Taskila, Heidi Washington, Gretchen Whitmer (DAll) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2020: #1 Coversheet) (DAll). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards #641715 v. Whitmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle B. Richards #641715
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristopher Taskila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretchen Whitmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Perttu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?