Mendez #229145 v. Brown
Petitioner: Fidel Mendez #229145
Respondent: Mike Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv00123
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Janet T Neff
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Copy of Order on Motion to Alter Judgment #15 sent via U.S. Mail to Fidel Mendez (mlc)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #11 and #13 motion to alter judgment; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Fidel Mendez #229145 re Supplement, #13 (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT re MOTION to alter judgment #11 named as, "motion to amend establishment of exhaustion requirements" by petitioner Fidel Mendez #229145 (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2-2A, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4-5, #5 Attachment 6) (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE by petitioner Fidel Mendez #229145 re MOTION to alter judgment #11 (mlc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to alter judgment by petitioner Fidel Mendez #229145; (mlc)
July 30, 2020 Certified Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability, #9 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #10 , Opinion (Screening) #8 sent via U.S. Mail to Fidel Mendez (mlc)
July 30, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; Petitioner's request for appointment of counsel #3 is DENIED; Petitioner's request for a temporary restraining order and for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED as moot; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION; Order and Judgment to issue; signed by Judge Janet T. Neff (Judge Janet T. Neff, clb)
July 17, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order, #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Fidel Mendez (mlc)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/14/2020 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
July 16, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #6 sent via U.S. Mail to Fidel Mendez (slk)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11550; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Fidel Mendez. (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for waiver of fees and costs re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Fidel Mendez. (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Fidel Mendez against Mike Brown. (Attachments: #1 Document Continuation) (LGra) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez #229145 v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fidel Mendez #229145
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?