Olver #972624 v. Brown
Petitioner: Willard A. Olver #972624
Respondent: Mike Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv00125
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Presiding Judge: Robert J Jonker
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Certified Copy of Order Denying Certificate of Appealability #12 , Opinion (Screening) #11 , Judgment Dismissing Habeas Action Under Rule 4 #13 sent via U.S. Mail to Willard A. Olver (slk)
July 28, 2020 Filing 13 JUDGMENT dismissing habeas action under Rule 4; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying certificate of appealability; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 OPINION; signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
July 21, 2020 Copy of Deficiency Order, #10 sent via U.S. Mail to Willard A. Olver (mlc)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DEFICIENCY ORDER: plaintiff/petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee or file the required documents to apply to proceed in forma pauperis; deficiency to be cured by 8/17/2020 or the action will be dismissed ; signed by Magistrate Judge Maarten Vermaat (cam)
July 20, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #9 sent via U.S. Mail to Willard A. Olver (slk)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of receipt of case (slk)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-11668; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (jlg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Correction re #5 Order Transferring Habeas Petition or Other Document to USCA. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 16, 2020 TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 Order Transferring Habeas Petition or Other Document to USCA on Willard A. Olver. Document mailed to Willard A. Olver, Pris. No. 972624, KINROSS CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, 4533 W. Industrial Park Drive, KINCHELOE, MI 49786. (MacKay, K) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (ATee) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 [ENTERED IN ERROR - SEE NOTICE OF CORRECTION # 7] ORDER Transferring Habeas Petition to USCA for the Sixth Circuit. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SSch) Modified on 7/17/2020 (ATee). [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Willard A. Olver. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Willard A. Olver. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION [MOTION] to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Willard A. Olver. (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Willard A. Olver against Mike Brown. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (NAhm) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 7/17/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olver #972624 v. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Willard A. Olver #972624
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Mike Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?