Richards #641715 v. Washington et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Brandon Richards #641715
Defendant: Don DeForge, Jpay Inc. and Heidi Washington
Case Number: 2:2020cv00146
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Michigan
Office: Northern Division (2) Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L Maloney
Referring Judge: Maarten Vermaat
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 25 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet) (slk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 24 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (mailed last page of docket sheet) (slk)
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for reconsideration re #12 by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (slk)
September 24, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 regarding documents that were filed #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 and Subpoena forms (mailed subpoena forms with the notice to plaintiff) (no motion for reconsideration was included in the envelope) (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 re MOTION to appoint counsel #16 , MOTION to change venue MOTION to disqualify judge #17 , MOTION for order named as, "motion for protective order and request for federal investigation and monitoring" #15 (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to change venue , MOTION to disqualify judge by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to appoint counsel by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for order named as, "motion for protective order and request for federal investigation and monitoring" by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Larry Taylor #432739) (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; mailed docket sheet to plaintiff (mlc)
September 8, 2020 Copy of Order Denying IFP - Three Strikes - Prisoner #12 , Opinion (Screening) #11 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle Brandon Richards (slk)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING IFP UNDER THREE STRIKES RULE: plaintiff to pay the entire fee of $400.00 within 28 days or the case will be dismissed; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 11 OPINION; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to produce a copy of complaint #1 as plaintiff is indigent and cannot afford to pay (letter format) by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to clarify named as, "motion for clarification and request for federal investigation and monitoring" by plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715; (mlc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and an investigation (mailed docket sheet showing when documents were filed) (slk)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; (previously mailed docket sheet to plaintiff) (mlc)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER from plaintiff Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 requesting docket sheet; and a list of cases (mailed docket sheet and a list of cases) (slk)
August 18, 2020 Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Kyle Brandon Richards (mlc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of receipt of case (mlc)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from Michigan Eastern, their case number 2:20-cv-12106; the documents listed above were electronically transferred to the Western District of Michigan (ndj)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Western District of Michigan. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (DPer) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.]
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] Modified text on 8/18/2020 (mlc).
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Magistrate Referral filed by Kyle Brandon Richards #641715 against Don DeForge, Jpay Inc., Heidi Washington (DAll) [Transferred from Michigan Eastern on 8/18/2020.] Modified text on 8/18/2020 (mlc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Michigan Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards #641715 v. Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Brandon Richards #641715
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don DeForge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jpay Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?